Stefan, Raluca Alexandra (CPSO#: 82987)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Romanian

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division Of Emergency Medicine
Suite C753
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4037
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

200 Elizabeth St
R Fraser Elliott Building
Ground floor - rm 480
Toronto General Hospital
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Canada
Phone: 4163403856
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R.A. Stefan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 13 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Stefan ( CPSO# 82987 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Emergency Medicine
Suite C753
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4037

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
R Fraser Elliott Building
Ground Floor - Room 480
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3856

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RALUCA ALEXANDRA STEFAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEFAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010