Stefanac, Mile (CPSO#: 85728)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Nov 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Oct 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sydney, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Halton Healthcare
Oakville Trafalgar Memoria Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: 905 845 2571
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Halton Healthcare
Georgetown Hospital
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Canada
Phone: 905 873 0111 Ext. 8505
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stefanac Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 12 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Stefanac ( CPSO# 85728 )

Business Address:
Halton Healthcare
Georgetown Hospital
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Phone Number: (905) 873-0111

Business Address:
Halton Healthcare
Oakville Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 338-4690

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Oct 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MILE STEFANAC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEFANAC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2006 to 22 Jan 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 23 Jan 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2007 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2008