Steinberg, Steven Garry (CPSO#: 29388)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Nov 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
77 Anishinaabeg Drive
Muncey ON  N0L1Y0
Phone: 5192890352
Fax: 5192890355
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

787 McLaren St.
North Bay ON  P1B 3M1
Canada
Phone: 705-840-0940
Fax: 7054820580
County: Territorial District of Nipissing
Electoral District: 08

Medical Records Location

Address: Jey's Business Record Storage 705.482.1838
Instructions: Patients please contact above to request a copy of medical records
Date Received: 15 Feb 2018

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVEN GARRY STEINBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEINBERG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 1997