Steinegger, Cathleen Margaret (CPSO#: 83788)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 29 Aug 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Nebraska, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Adolescent Medicine
555 University Ave.
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-5169
Fax: (416) 813-5392
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 29 Aug 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2005
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Oct 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Nov 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 06 Dec 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Dec 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 13 Dec 2012 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Cathleen  Margaret  Steinegger  may  practise  medicine  independently  in
            paediatrics, limited to adolescent medicine, only.