Steinitz, Tracy Lynn Farquharson (CPSO#: 71207)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Dec 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Dec 1999

Summary

Former Name: Ridlington, Tracy Lynn Farquharson (used until: 10 Jan 1999 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Emergency Dept
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 968-2844
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Loyalist College Student Health Cli
376 Wallbridge-Loyalist
Belleville ON  K8N 5B9
Canada
Phone: 613-969-1913 Ext. 2374
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Steinitz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 25 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Steinitz ( CPSO# 78331 )
Dr. T. Steinitz ( CPSO# 71207 )

Business Address:
Suite WCA365
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 968-2844

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 27 Nov 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TRACY LYNN FARQUHARSON STEINITZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEINITZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 1999