Steinmann, Tamra Marian (CPSO#: 97691)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Maitland Valley Medical Centre
180 Cambria Road North
Goderich ON  N7A 4N8
Phone: (519) 524-6060
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. M. Steinmann Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 07 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Steinmann ( CPSO# 97691 )

Business Address:
Maitland Valley Family Health Team
180 Cambria Road North
Goderich ON  N7A 4N8
Phone Number: (519) 524-6060

Business Address:
120 Napier Street
Goderich ON  N7A 1W5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TAMRA MARIAN STEINMANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEINMANN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2014