Steinraths, Michelle Rene (CPSO#: 83799)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Dec 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Dec 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Genetics Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 31 Oct 2005 to 27 Nov 2005
Elective Trainee - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 28 Nov 2005 to 30 Dec 2005
Elective Trainee - Medical Genetics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Dec 2005