Stel, Karen Grace (CPSO#: 73504)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Apr 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4000 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 2R9
Phone: (416) 494-7512
Fax: (416) 492-3740
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN GRACE STEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 2002