Stephenson, Anne Louise (CPSO#: 69228)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Nov 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Nov 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Respirology
St. Michael's Hospital
Room 6-040
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5409
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 17 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNE LOUISE STEPHENSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEPHENSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2000