Stephenson, Elizabeth Anne (CPSO#: 80214)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Oct 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 19 Oct 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Columbia University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Cardiology
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6142
Fax: (416) 813-7547
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 19 Oct 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2003
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Sep 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Aug 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 19 Oct 2011 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Elizabeth Anne Stephenson may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Paediatrics, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Stephenson holds
                        an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Stephenson
                  no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.