Stephenson, Susan Elizabeth (CPSO#: 27377)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Dec 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Dec 2006

Summary

Date of Death: 22-Jan-2007

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1980 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1974
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Dec 2006