Sterescu, Anca Elena (CPSO#: 83649)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Dec 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Dec 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Montreal, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 15 Dec 2006
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Dec 2006