Concerns
Source:
Other
Active Date: December 20, 2023
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Charges
Robert Joseph Stern was charged with the following offences:
1. 3 Counts of Failure to Comply with a Condition of his Release Order, on or about December 16, 2023, contrary to section 145(5)a of the Criminal Code of Canada.
Date of Charge: December 17, 2023 and December 20, 2023
Place of Charge: Stratford, Ontario
Stratford Police Service
Source:
Other
Active Date: July 11, 2023
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Findings of Guilt
Robert Stern was found guilty of the following offences:
1. Possession of child pornography, contrary to Section 163.1(4) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
2. Making child pornography, contrary to Section 163.1(2) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
3. Voyeurism, contrary to Section 162(1) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
Date: July 11, 2023
SENTENCE: Pending at time of posting
Source:
Other
Active Date: December 9, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Bail Conditions
In November 2022, the following Conditions of Release (Bail Conditions) were imposed on Robert Joseph Stern:
1. Stern must remain within the territorial jurisdiction of Canada.
2. Stern must notify Woodstock Police Service of any change in address, employment, or occupation.
3. Stern must not communicate, directly or indirectly with a named person.
4. Stern must not go to a specified location.
5. Stern must not enter within 150M of named areas frequented by named persons.
6. Stern must deposit all passports with the Woodstock Police Service.
7. Stern must reside at a named location.
Source:
Other
Active Date: December 9, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Charges
Robert Joseph Stern was charged with the following offences:
1. Possession of child pornography on or about April 1, 2013, contrary to Section 163.1(4) of the Criminal Code.
2. Voyeurism for a sexual purpose on or about April 1, 2013, contrary to Section 162(1)(c) of the Criminal Code.
3. Two counts of Voyeurism on or about August 1, 2020, contrary to Section 162(1) of the Criminal Code.
Date of Charge: December 2, 2022
Place of Charge: Woodstock
Woodstock Police Service
Source:
Member
Active Date: October 29, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Robert Joseph Stern to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 29, 2022:
A College investigation is being conducted into whether Dr. Stern engaged in professional misconduct. In the face of this investigation, Dr. Stern has ceased to practise medicine in all jurisdictions and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or service.
Source:
Other
Active Date: August 16, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Bail Conditions
On August 15, 2022, the following Conditions of Release (Bail Conditions) were imposed on Robert Joseph Stern:
1. Stern must reside with his surety at a named address except while residing at a residential treatment facility or during the week of August 15-22, 2022, where he will live with a named person.
2. Stern must not be in the company of or communicate, directly or indirectly, by any physical, electronic or other means with males or females under the age of 16 years, unless in the presence of one of his sureties except if such person is a family member and Stern is in the direct presence of the guardian of that child or has the dated, written permission of the lawful guardian of that child.
3. Stern must not attend a public park or public swimming area where persons under the age of 16 years are present or can reasonably be expected to be present, or a daycare centre, school ground, playground or community centre except in the direct presence of one of his sureties.
4. Stern must not provide medical or any related care to any person under the age of 16 except if he is in the direct company of another member of his hospital’s nursing or medical staff.
5. Stern must not possess or use any computers or any other device that has access to the Internet or other digital network except while supervised at a treatment facility or for travel purposes or for counselling appointments approved of in advance by one of his sureties or for the purposes of operating his vehicle or in the direct presence of one of his sureties or at his place of employment for the purposes of employment, where he has shown his employer the conditions of this bail order.
Source:
Other
Active Date: August 16, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Charges
Robert Joseph Stern was charged with the following offences:
1. Accessing child pornography between August 5, 2021 and July 7, 2022, contrary to Section 163.1 (4.1) of the Criminal Code.
2. Distribution of child pornography between August 5, 2021 and August 15, 2021, contrary to Section 163.1(3) of the Criminal Code.
Date of Charge: July 14, 2022
Place of Charge: Woodstock
Woodstock Police Service