Sterns, Laurence David (CPSO#: 82209)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 12 Jan 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Jan 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Feb 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Apr 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jan 2006