Sternthal, Edward (CPSO#: 25411)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jan 1973

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jan 1973

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Rudd Clinic
123 Edward Street
fourth floor
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Phone: (416) 597-0997 Ext. 245
Fax: (416) 597-2912
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 14 Mar 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDWARD STERNTHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STERNTHAL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 1973

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: July 5, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence

On September 30, 2015, at the Small Claims Court in Toronto, a finding of professional negligence was made against Dr. Edward Sternthal in respect to an incident that took place in May 2010.