Stevenson, Margo Nicole Morassut (CPSO#: 103339)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 2018

Expiry Date:  25 Jul 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Elective as of 02 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Neonatal Intensive Care Unit
76 Stuart St
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-3232
Electoral District: 06

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARGO NICOLE MORASSUT STEVENSON shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. STEVENSON is enrolled at QUEEN'S UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. STEVENSON shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. STEVENSON is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. STEVENSON shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times: when Dr. STEVENSON is no longer enrolled in the postgraduate medical education program for which the certificate is issued; when Dr. STEVENSON no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada); or when fifteen weeks have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 25 Jul 2018.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 01 Apr 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 02 Jun 2016 to 28 Jun 2016
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 28 Aug 2017 to 20 Sep 2017
Elective Trainee - Developmental Paediatrics

Queen's University, 02 Jul 2018 to 25 Jul 2018
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Apr 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Sep 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2018