Stewart, Andrea Kirsten (CPSO#: 78043)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Oct 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
Geriatric Psychiatry
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone: (613) 722-6521 Ext. 6637
Fax: (613) 748-4995
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Montfort Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Canada
Phone: (613) 746-4621 Ext. 3908
Fax: (613) 748-4997
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrea Stewart Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Stewart ( CPSO# 78043 )

Business Address:
1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3E5

Business Address:
101 Progress Crescent
Kapuskasing ON  P5N 3H5
Phone Number: (705) 337-6111

Business Address:
29 Byng Avenue
Kapuskasing ON  P5N 1W6
Phone Number: (705) 335-8468

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6

Business Address:
The Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone Number: (613) 722-6521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
Notre-Dame Hospital Hearst
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREA KIRSTEN STEWART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEWART is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2004 to 30 Sep 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2006 to 30 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2007 to 31 Mar 2008
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2007