Stewart, Ann Margaret (CPSO#: 82989)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Dec 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Centre at 410
410 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M4X 1K2
Phone: (416) 867-3728
Fax: (416) 867-3726
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ann Stewart Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 31 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Stewart ( CPSO# 82989 )

Business Address:
410 Sherbourne Street
4th Floor
Toronto ON  M4X 1K2
Phone Number: (416) 867-3728

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANN MARGARET STEWART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEWART is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 21 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 22 Oct 2007 to 21 Oct 2008
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2007