Stewart, Dwight James (CPSO#: 67001)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1997

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
14 St Andrews Street
Cambridge ON  N1S 1M3
Phone: (519) 624-2121
Fax: (519) 624-1949
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Listowel Memorial Hospital
255 Elizabeth Street East
Listowel ON  N4W 2P5
Canada
Phone: (519) 292-2080
County: County of Perth
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dwight James Stewart Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 28 2008


Corporation Name: Dr. Dwight James Stewart Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 19 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Stewart ( CPSO# 67001 )

Business Address:
14 St. Andrews Street
Cambridge ON  N1S 1M3
Phone Number: (519) 624-2121

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DWIGHT JAMES STEWART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEWART is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1997

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: August 13, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)