Stewart, Gregory Eric (CPSO#: 91018)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
32 Centennial Dr
Seaforth ON  N0K 1W0
Phone: (519) 600-2273
Fax: (519) 600-2501
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gregory Stewart Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 10 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Stewart ( CPSO# 91018 )

Business Address:
32 Centennial Drive
Seaforth ON  N0K 1W0
Phone Number: (519) 600-2273

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Seaforth Community Hospital Seaforth

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGORY ERIC STEWART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEWART is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2011