Stewart, John David (CPSO#: 25642)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1972 to 15 Jun 1973
Other - Rotating Internship

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1973
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Aug 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Executive Committee Effective: 20 Nov 2006
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 13 Dec 2006
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 09 Jun 2007
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 04 Sep 2007
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 15 May 2008
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 03 Mar 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 2010

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 11 Jul 2007
Summary:

On July 11, 2007, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons, found 
Dr. John David Stewart to have committed an act of professional misconduct in that he failed to 
maintain the standard of practice of the profession.  The Committee ordered the following: 
 
1.                  The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to suspend Dr. Stewart s 
certificate of registration for a period of twelve (12) weeks commencing immediately, but giving 
credit to the period of suspension from June 9, 2007  to July 11, 2007, so that the suspension 
will cease on September 4, 2007 at 12:01 a.m.; 
 
  
2.                  The Discipline Committee directs that the following terms, conditions and 
limitations be placed on Dr. Stewart s certificate of registration: 
 
(a)                Dr. Stewart may not practise more than 2  days per week divided between 
University of Toronto Health Services (UTHS) and Parexel/Mankind Pharmaceuticals, or other 
setting approved by the College; 
  
(b)               Dr. Stewart will not remove any patient charts from the office in which they are 
located; 
  
(c)                Dr. Stewart shall complete all patient charts within 24 hours of seeing the 
patient; 
  
(d)               Dr. Stewart shall follow-up on all laboratory results within 7 days of receiving 
the results; 
 
(e)                Dr. Stewart will remain enrolled in the PHP and will abide by its 
recommendations; 
 
(f)                 Dr. Stewart shall only practise at UTHS or other clinical practice setting 
acceptable to the College under the supervision of a clinical monitor acceptable to the College 
who has signed an undertaking acceptable to the College.  The practice monitor shall review Dr. 
Stewart s charts at least once a week to ensure that his charts are up to date, his referrals are 
timely and he is following up on laboratory results within one week of receiving the results.  The 
monitor will report to the College bi-weekly or earlier should he/she find that Dr. Stewart has 
failed to comply with any of the conditions in this order.  All of the monitoring and reporting 
will be at Dr. Stewart s expense; 
 
(g)                Should the College receive a report from the practice monitor indicating that 
Dr. Stewart is not in compliance with any of the conditions in this order, the College may 
immediately suspend his certificate of registration, such suspension to take effect immediately 
until the practice monitor shall report to the College that, to his/her satisfaction, Dr. Stewart has 
become current on his notes, reports and letters and is in compliance with this order at which 
time the College shall reinstate his certificate of registration; and 
 
  
 
(h)                Dr. Stewart will assist the College in monitoring his compliance with this 
order by allowing a College representative to interview his staff and inspect his office from time 
to time, at his expense. 
 
3.                  The Discipline Committee orders Dr. Stewart to pay to the College costs in 
the amount of $2,500.00, within 60 days of his return to practice following the period of 
suspension.  
 
4.         The Discipline Committee directs the results of this proceeding to be included in the 
register. 
 
  
 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jul 11, 2007