Stewart, Martin Christopher (CPSO#: 62187)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone: (905) 985-2895
Fax: (844) 874-3527
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Martin Stewart Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Stewart ( CPSO# 62187 )

Business Address:
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-2895


Corporation Name: Ali Gauster Schurter Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Schurter ( CPSO# 82718 )
Dr. R. Adams ( CPSO# 72364 )
Dr. F. Ali ( CPSO# 76181 )
Dr. D. Wang ( CPSO# 90666 )
Dr. B. Tse ( CPSO# 91489 )
Dr. C. Hadden ( CPSO# 100522)
Dr. J. Moran ( CPSO# 100903)
Dr. A. Bruno ( CPSO# 101160)
Dr. E. Russell ( CPSO# 59302 )
Dr. S. Hyshka ( CPSO# 67972 )
Dr. M. Brown ( CPSO# 69023 )
Dr. A. Pawley ( CPSO# 87461 )
Dr. A. Gauster ( CPSO# 100273)
Dr. A. Dayal ( CPSO# 79055 )
Dr. N. Kazarian ( CPSO# 71482 )
Dr. S. Shepherd ( CPSO# 71354 )
Dr. F. Nasser-Sharif ( CPSO# 72700 )
Dr. A. Chiella ( CPSO# 74700 )
Dr. K. Best ( CPSO# 75245 )
Dr. K. Ferguson ( CPSO# 76506 )
Dr. S. Cull ( CPSO# 82751 )
Dr. A. Armstrong ( CPSO# 84261 )
Dr. R. Wray ( CPSO# 86630 )
Dr. J. Ross ( CPSO# 88724 )
Dr. H. Nguyen ( CPSO# 88893 )
Dr. T. Stryde ( CPSO# 73931 )
Dr. C. Westbrook ( CPSO# 89258 )
Dr. J. Tuck ( CPSO# 64782 )
Dr. M. Stewart ( CPSO# 62187 )
Dr. S. Russell ( CPSO# 60638 )
Dr. G. Mercer ( CPSO# 60472 )
Dr. M. Gilmour ( CPSO# 59725 )
Dr. A. Brown ( CPSO# 59455 )
Dr. P. Puckrin ( CPSO# 27488 )
Dr. R. Allin ( CPSO# 20746 )

Business Address:
Medical Associates of Port Perry
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-2895

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 04 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTIN CHRISTOPHER STEWART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEWART is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1996 to 31 Mar 1996
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 28 Feb 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1991