Steyn, Jacobus Johannes (CPSO#: 78540)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Oct 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Oct 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Pretoria, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 102
135 Ormond Street
Brockville ON  K6V 5Y2
Phone: (613) 342-4454
Fax: (613) 342-8065
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.J. & M. Steyn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Steyn ( CPSO# 78540 )
Dr. M. Steyn ( CPSO# 78491 )

Business Address:
102 &202- 135 Ormond Street
Brockville ON  K6V 5Y2
Phone Number: (613) 342-4454

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACOBUS JOHANNES STEYN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEYN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Oct 2002 to 30 Jan 2003
International Specialist Physician - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jan 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2003
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Jun 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Oct 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2005