Stircu, Cristina Ecaterina (CPSO#: 89806)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Sep 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Laurier Medical and Walk In Clinic
497 Laurier Avenue, Unit 9
Milton ON  L9T 3K8
Phone: (905) 203 0624
Fax: (289) 270 2970
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Cristina Stircu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Stircu ( CPSO# 89806 )

Business Address:
Laurier Medical and Walk-in Clinic
497 Laurier Avenue
Unit 9
Milton ON  L9T 3K8
Phone Number: (905) 203-0624

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Sep 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CRISTINA ECATERINA STIRCU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STIRCU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2008 to 24 Nov 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 25 Nov 2008 to 01 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2009 to 01 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2010