Stoller, Jacqueline Sian (CPSO#: 93535)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Athlete's Care
801 York Mills Road, Suite 103a
M3B 1X7
Toronto ON  M5H 4C7
Phone: 416-479-8377
Fax: 416-479-8688
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
Rumsey Centre
Cardiac Rehabilitation
347 Rumsey Road
Toronto ON  M4G 2V6
Canada
Phone: 416-597-3422 Ext. 5247
Fax: 416-425-0301
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

University of Toronto
Health and Wellness Centre
214 College Street, 2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M5T 2Z9
Canada
Phone: 416-978-8030
Fax: 416-971-2089
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACQUELINE SIAN STOLLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STOLLER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2012