Stoller, Rebecca Anne (CPSO#: 77764)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 703
240 Duncan Mill Road
Toronto ON  M3B 3S6
Phone: (416) 494-7396
Fax: (416) 494-0129
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REBECCA ANNE STOLLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STOLLER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2005 to 31 Mar 2005
Clinical Fellow - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2004