Stone, Angela Marie (CPSO#: 82788)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Nov 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Nov 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
Suite C7 16
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6018
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Michael Garron Hospital
Department of Critical Care
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Canada
Phone: (416) 461-8272
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

5310 Explorer Drive
Mississauga
Mississauga ON  L4W 5H8
Canada
Phone: 647-428-2006
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Angela Stone Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Stone ( CPSO# 82788 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
C7 16 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6018

Business Address:
Michael Garron Hospital
Department of Critical Care
825 Coxwell Ave
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 461-8272

Business Address:
5310 Explorer Drive
Mississauga ON  L4W 5H8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Nov 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 30 Nov 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANGELA MARIE STONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STONE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 28 Feb 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2010 to 30 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2010