Stone, Erin Keely (CPSO#: 84350)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 2
750 Taylor Creek Drive
Orleans ON  K4A 0Z9
Phone: (613) 830-8388
Fax: (613) 830-8588
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stone-Rutherford Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 17 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Stone ( CPSO# 91439 )
Dr. E. Stone ( CPSO# 84350 )
Dr. D. Rutherford ( CPSO# 30774 )
Dr. M. Stone ( CPSO# 30004 )

Business Address:
Suite 202
86 Angeline Street South
Lindsay ON  K9V 6C5
Phone Number: (705) 324-5870


Corporation Name: Low & Stone Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Stone ( CPSO# 84350 )
Dr. T. Low ( CPSO# 84392 )

Business Address:
Suite 2
750 Taylor Creek Drive
Orleans ON  K4A 0Z9

Business Address:
Monfort Hospital
ICU Medicine and Emergency Medicine
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIN KEELY STONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STONE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2008