Stone, Jonathan Francis (CPSO#: 66678)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 110
857 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7L 4T1
Phone: (519) 436-1100
Fax: (519) 436-1106
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jonathan Stone Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Stone ( CPSO# 66678 )

Business Address:
110 - 857 Grand Avenue
Chatham ON  N7L 4T1
Phone Number: (519) 436-1100

Business Address:
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Phone Number: (519) 352-6400

Business Address:
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
325 Margaret Avenue
Wallaceburg ON  N8A 2A7
Phone Number: (519) 352-6400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
St Joseph's Health Services,Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Sydenham District Hospital Wallaceburg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN FRANCIS STONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STONE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1999