Stone, Karina Alexandra (CPSO#: 94198)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad Central de Venezuela, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Centre for Addiction and Mental Health, Health Records Department, 175 College Street, Toronto, ON, M5T 1P7
Date Received: 23 Jun 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 03 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jul 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 11 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2016