Stone, Millicent Anne Ellen (CPSO#: 74517)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 26 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 27 May 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 27 May 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 07 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 07 Jul 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jul 2012