Stone, Samuel Bradley (CPSO#: 82423)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Feb 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Feb 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100 Ext. 1050
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Samuel B. Stone Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Stone ( CPSO# 82423 )

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Feb 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMUEL BRADLEY STONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STONE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 22 May 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 23 May 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 13 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

University of Toronto, 29 Aug 2011 to 25 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 29 Sep 2011 to 23 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Feb 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 2011