Stone, Tanya Adrienne Robyn (CPSO#: 95221)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Welcare Centre
Suite 305
1366 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4T 3A7
Phone: (416) 962-2964
Fax: (416) 962-2526
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Medcan Clinic
Suite 1500
150 York Street
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Canada
Phone: (416) 350-5900
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tanya Stone Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 03 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Stone ( CPSO# 95221 )

Business Address:
150 York Street
Suite 1500
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Phone Number: (416) 350-5900

Business Address:
The Welcare Centre
1366 Yonge Street
Suite 305
Toronto ON  M4T 3A7
Phone Number: (416) 962-2964

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TANYA ADRIENNE ROBYN STONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STONE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013