Stormon, Michael Oswald (CPSO#: 73803)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Sydney, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Sep 2001
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Sep 2001