Stovel, Rebecca Gilman (CPSO#: 91358)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medicine
Women's College Hospital
3rd Floor- 76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-6400
Fax: 416-352-5527
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sunnybrook Hospital
Department of Medicine
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: 416-480-6100
Fax: 416-352-5527
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

UHN-SHS
Department of Medicine
200 Elizabeth Street
Eaton North, 14th floor
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Canada
Phone: 416-340-4800 Ext. 3155
Fax: 416-352-5527
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

NYGH
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
Phone: 416-756-6000
Fax: 416-352-5527
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
General Internal Medicine Effective: 26 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REBECCA GILMAN STOVEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STOVEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 27 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 28 Mar 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Mar 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2012 to 31 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Mar 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 02 Apr 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2015