Strakacz, Marta (CPSO#: 83969)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jan 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jan 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1500 dundas street east
Mississauga ON  L4X1L4
Phone: 905-212-1433
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Room 1123A, Davis Building (Around
3359 Mississauga Rd. N.
Mississauga ON  L5L1C6
Canada
Phone: 905-828-5255
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

110- 3530 derry road east
Malton ON  L4T 4E3
Canada
Phone: (416) 741-2273
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Strakacz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 13 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Strakacz ( CPSO# 83969 )

Business Address:
Suite 110-111
3530 Derry Road East
Malton ON  L4T 4E3
Phone Number: (905) 672-2273

Business Address:
1123A - 3359 Mississauga Road
Mississauga ON  L5L 1C6
Phone Number: (905) 828-5255

Business Address:
1500 Dundas Street East
Mississauga ON  L4X 1L4
Phone Number: (905) 672-2273

Business Address:
4000 Highway 7
Vaughan ON  L4L 8Z2
Phone Number: (905) 672-2273

Business Address:
80 College Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2E2
Phone Number: (416) 967-2600

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 17 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTA STRAKACZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STRAKACZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Sep 2015 to 04 Dec 2015
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2006