Stratford, Andrew Francis Cyril (CPSO#: 74885)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 209
1005 Elgin Street West
Cobourg ON  K9A 5J4
Phone: (905) 373-4366
Fax: (905) 373-0687
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

N H H
1000 De Palma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 4L9
Canada
Phone: (905) 372-6811
County: County of Northumberland
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. F. C. Stratford Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Stratford ( CPSO# 74885 )

Business Address:
209 - 1005 Elgin Street West
Cobourg ON  K9A 5J4
Phone Number: (905) 373-4366

Business Address:
N H H
1000 DePalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone Number: (905) 372-6811

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW FRANCIS CYRIL STRATFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STRATFORD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Sep 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Oct 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005