Strayer, Reuben Jesse (CPSO#: 90428)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Univ of Texas Southwestern Med School, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 151 First Avenue #62 New York, NY 10003 USA
Date Received: 14 Apr 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 May 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016