Strickland, Sarah Veronique (CPSO#: 91020)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Nov 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Nov 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
451 Smyth Road
Room 4155
Ottawa, ON
Ottawa ON  K1H 8M5
Phone: 613-562-5422
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Sep 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH VERONIQUE STRICKLAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STRICKLAND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 02 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2011