Stride-Darnley, Benjamin John (CPSO#: 110252)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

Expiry Date:  16 Dec 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakehead University
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5E1
Phone: (807) 766-7300
Electoral District: 09

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BENJAMIN JOHN STRIDE-DARNLEY shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. STRIDE-DARNLEY is enrolled at NORTHERN ONTARIO SCHOOL OF MEDICINE;

(2) Dr. STRIDE-DARNLEY shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. STRIDE-DARNLEY is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. STRIDE-DARNLEY shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. STRIDE-DARNLEY is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. STRIDE-DARNLEY no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 16 Dec 2018.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2018 to 16 Dec 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Dec 2018