Strike, Melanie Katherine (CPSO#: 95936)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Royal Ottawa Mental Health Ctr
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone: 6137226521
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Canada
Phone: 6137212000
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 18 May 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELANIE KATHERINE STRIKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STRIKE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 04 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 05 May 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 04 May 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 05 May 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 04 May 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 05 May 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Forensic Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Forensic Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2017