Strobel, Stephenson Baines (CPSO#: 107087)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Mar 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Mar 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Norway House Hospital
Norway House MB  R0B1B0
Phone: (607) 319-1821

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System Port Colborne General Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System,Douglas Memorial Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHENSON BAINES STROBEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STROBEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2018