Stroker, Claire (CPSO#: 92297)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Kansas, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Dec 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Apr 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Sep 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 15 Sep 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016