Struthers, Colin Nuttall (CPSO#: 92427)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 May 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 May 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
10 South Front Street
Belleville ON  K8N 2Y3
Phone: (613) 779-9699
Fax: (613) 779-9689
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

265 Dundas Street, East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Canada
Phone: (613) 969-7400
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Colin Struthers Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Struthers ( CPSO# 92427 )

Business Address:
Unit 200
10 South Front Street
Belleville ON  K8N 2Y3
Phone Number: (613) 779-9699

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 29 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. COLIN NUTTALL STRUTHERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STRUTHERS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 14 Jan 2010 to 09 Feb 2010
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Apr 2013 to 27 Apr 2013
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

Queen's University, 28 Apr 2013 to 17 May 2013
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Feb 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 May 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 May 2014

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: February 12, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)