Strychowsky, Julie Elizabeth (CPSO#: 90647)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
B3 444A
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: 519-685-8500 Ext. 58242
Fax: 519-685-8185
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Julie Strychowsky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 10 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Strychowsky ( CPSO# 90647 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
B3- 444A
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8242

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIE ELIZABETH STRYCHOWSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STRYCHOWSKY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2015