Stulberg, Jennifer Robyn (CPSO#: 84799)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Oct 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Oct 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1881 Yonge Street, Ste 503
Toronto ON  M4S 3C4
Phone: 647-748-1881
Fax: 647-748-1882
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER ROBYN STULBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STULBERG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 24 May 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 25 May 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2009