Subramanian, Chandrasekaran (CPSO#: 104806)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Rajah Muthiah Medical College, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Scarborough Hospital
3050 Lawrence Ave. E.
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: 416-438-2911
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Chandrasekaran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 07 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Chandrasekaran ( CPSO# 104707)
Dr. C. Subramanian ( CPSO# 104806)

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
Department of Maternal Fetal Medicine
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6060


Corporation Name: C. Subramanian Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Subramanian ( CPSO# 104806)

Business Address:
The Scarborough Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1P 2V5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 07 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHANDRASEKARAN SUBRAMANIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUBRAMANIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2014 to 19 Oct 2014
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 20 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Mar 2017
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2017