Subramanian, Ganesh Kutala (CPSO#: 84522)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Tamil

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Sleep Laboratory
Suite 202
5359 Dundas Street West
Etobicoke ON  M9C 5N2
Phone: (416) 622-3266
Fax: (416) 622-7831
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

40 FINCHGATE BLVD
SUITE 216
Respirology and Sleep Medicine
Brampton ON  L6T 3J1
Canada
Phone: (905) 456-3699 Ext. 28
Fax: (905) 456-8768
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

611 HOLLY AVENUE
SUITE 205
MILTON ONTARIO
Milton ON  L9T 0K4
Canada
Phone: 905 636 9772
Fax: 905 203 2882
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ganesh Subramanian Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Subramanian ( CPSO# 84522 )

Business Address:
Queensway Sleep Laboratory
202 - 5359 Dundas Street West
Etobicoke ON  M9C 5N2
Phone Number: (416) 622-3266

Business Address:
Brampton Sleep Clinic
Suite 216
40 Finchgate Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6T 3J1
Phone Number: (416) 568-3743

Business Address:
Medsleep - Milton
611 Holly Avenue
Suite 205
Milton ON  L9T 0K4
Phone Number: (905) 636-9772

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 04 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GANESH KUTALA SUBRAMANIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUBRAMANIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 20 Sep 2010 to 17 Oct 2010
Elective Trainee - Respirology

University of Toronto, 13 Dec 2010 to 06 Feb 2011
Elective Trainee - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Feb 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2011