Subramanian, Priya (CPSO#: 90102)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Mar 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 12 Mar 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Rajah Muthiah Medical College, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PEPP Program LHSC Victoria Hospital
P O Box 5010, Station B
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 667-6662
Fax: (519) 667-6689
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Priya Subramanian Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 05 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Subramanian ( CPSO# 90102 )

Business Address:
LHSC Victoria Hospital
P.O. Box 5010, Station B
800 Commissioners Road East
Suite A632
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 667-6662

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 12 Mar 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Jan 2009 to 16 Feb 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 17 Feb 2009 to 16 Feb 2010
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 17 Feb 2010 to 11 Mar 2010
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Mar 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Jan 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Jan 2016 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Priya Subramanian may practise medicine independently in psychiatry.