Suchak, Amar Avinash (CPSO#: 92403)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jan 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jan 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
120, 6707 Elbow Drive SW
Calgary AB  T2V 0E3
Phone: (403) 777-3003
Fax: (403) 777-3008

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
Northwest Territories
Nunavut
Saskatchewan
Yukon

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMAR AVINASH SUCHAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUCHAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2010